NE LB16 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB549 amended into LB16 by AM448
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB549 amended into LB16 by AM448
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to licensing, trust accounts, and unfair trade practices under the Nebraska Real Estate License Act
Title
Change provisions relating to licensing, trust accounts, and unfair trade practices under the Nebraska Real Estate License Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB549 amended into LB16 by AM448 |
2017-03-29 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 29, 2017 |
2017-03-23 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 23, 2017 |
2017-03-23 | Legislature | Wayne explanation of vote |
2017-03-23 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2017-03-23 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-0-3 |
2017-03-23 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2017-03-21 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2017-03-16 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2017-03-16 | Legislature | Lindstrom AM448 adopted |
2017-03-16 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER10 adopted |
2017-03-03 | Legislature | Lindstrom AM448 filed |
2017-03-01 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER10 filed |
2017-03-01 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER10 |
2017-02-24 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2017-01-24 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2017-01-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 17, 2017 |
2017-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2017-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |