NE LB16 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-19 - Approved by Governor on February 15, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to title to Champion Mill State Historical Park

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to title to Champion Mill State Historical Park

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-19LegislatureApproved by Governor on February 15, 2013
2013-02-12LegislaturePresented to Governor on February 11, 2013
2013-02-11LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2013-02-11LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 49-0-0
2013-02-06LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2013-02-05LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2013-01-30LegislaturePlaced on Select File
2013-01-29LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2013-01-24LegislaturePlaced on General File
2013-01-16LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 23, 2013
2013-01-14LegislatureReferred to Natural Resources Committee
2013-01-10LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback