NE LB16 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - Bill withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change composition of certain district court judicial districts

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change composition of certain district court judicial districts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-10 Bill withdrawn
2011-03-10 Wightman MO18 prevailed
2011-03-09 Wightman MO18 Withdraw bill filed
2011-01-10 Referred to Judiciary Committee
2011-01-06 Date of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback