NE LB159 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor on May 10, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor on May 10, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to when special assessments are payable for cities of the metropolitan class
Title
Change provisions relating to when special assessments are payable for cities of the metropolitan class
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 10, 2017 |
2017-05-04 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 04, 2017 |
2017-05-04 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2017-05-04 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 |
2017-05-02 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2017-04-26 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2017-04-26 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER69 adopted |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER69 filed |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER69 |
2017-04-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2017-04-20 | Legislature | McCollister AM1097 adopted |
2017-04-20 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM22 adopted |
2017-04-19 | Legislature | McCollister AM1097 filed |
2017-01-25 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM22 filed |
2017-01-25 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM22 |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 24, 2017 |
2017-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2017-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |