NE LB158 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for restoration of voting rights upon completion of a felony sentence or probation for a felony
Title
Provide for restoration of voting rights upon completion of a felony sentence or probation for a felony
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-03-03 | Legislature | McCollister name added |
2021-02-23 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2021-02-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 24, 2021 |
2021-01-13 | Legislature | Hansen, M. name added |
2021-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2021-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |