NE LB156 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Approved by Governor on May 24, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Approved by Governor on May 24, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Municipal Inland Port Authority Act and change provisions of the Site and Building Development Act
Title
Adopt the Municipal Inland Port Authority Act and change provisions of the Site and Building Development Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Legislature - Wayne AM956 adopted (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Legislature - Urban Affairs AM223 adopted (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Legislature - Wayne AM737 adopted (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Legislature - Wayne AM956 adopted (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Legislature - Urban Affairs AM223 adopted (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Legislature - Wayne AM737 adopted (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 24, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 19, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2021-05-19 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2021-05-19 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2021-04-21 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST14 |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | McKinney AM985 withdrawn |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Wayne AM956 adopted |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Wayne AM933 withdrawn |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Wayne AM918 withdrawn |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER33 adopted |
2021-04-15 | Legislature | McKinney AM985 filed |
2021-04-14 | Legislature | Wayne AM956 filed |
2021-04-12 | Legislature | Wayne AM933 filed |
2021-04-09 | Legislature | Wayne AM918 filed |
2021-03-30 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER33 filed |
2021-03-30 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER33 |
2021-03-24 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2021-03-24 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-03-24 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM223 adopted |
2021-03-24 | Legislature | Wayne AM737 adopted |
2021-03-24 | Legislature | Wayne AM737 filed |
2021-03-11 | Legislature | Urban Affairs priority bill |
2021-03-01 | Legislature | Groene name added |
2021-02-18 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM223 filed |
2021-02-18 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM223 |
2021-02-04 | Legislature | Hansen, M. name added |
2021-01-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 02, 2021 |
2021-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2021-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |