NE LB153 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB153 amended into LB705 by AM1681
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Extraordinary Increase in Special Education Expenditures Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Extraordinary Increase in Special Education Expenditures Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-01LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB153 amended into LB705 by AM1681
2023-06-01LegislatureIndefinitely Postponed
2023-04-25LegislatureConrad name added
2023-04-20LegislatureEducation AM1421 filed
2023-04-20LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM1421
2023-01-31LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 07, 2023
2023-01-25LegislatureHalloran name added
2023-01-11LegislatureReferred to Education Committee
2023-01-09LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback