NE LB153 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Approved by Governor on August 17, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Approved by Governor on August 17, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to the taxation of military retirement benefits
Title
Change provisions relating to the taxation of military retirement benefits
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brewer [N] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-12 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Legislature - Brewer AM3003 adopted (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Legislature - Returned to Select File for specific amendment (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Legislature - Brewer AM2064 adopted (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Legislature - Brewer AM3003 adopted (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Legislature - Returned to Select File for specific amendment (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Legislature - Brewer AM2064 adopted (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on August 17, 2020 |
2020-08-12 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on August 12, 2020 |
2020-08-12 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-08-12 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 |
2020-07-23 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading Second |
2020-07-21 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Reengrossment |
2020-07-21 | Legislature | Brewer AM3003 adopted |
2020-07-21 | Legislature | Returned to Select File for specific amendment |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Brewer AM3003 filed |
2020-02-10 | Legislature | Walz name added |
2020-01-27 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2020-01-24 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2020-01-24 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER137 adopted |
2020-01-14 | Legislature | Hilgers name added |
2020-01-14 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER137 filed |
2020-01-14 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER137 |
2020-01-13 | Legislature | Quick name added |
2020-01-13 | Legislature | McCollister name added |
2020-01-13 | Legislature | Halloran name added |
2020-01-13 | Legislature | Slama name added |
2020-01-13 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2020-01-13 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-01-13 | Legislature | Brewer AM2064 adopted |
2020-01-13 | Legislature | Murman name added |
2020-01-13 | Legislature | Erdman name added |
2020-01-10 | Legislature | Wayne name added |
2020-01-10 | Legislature | Brewer AM2064 filed |
2020-01-09 | Legislature | La Grone name added |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-05-16 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | Lowe priority bill |
2019-02-06 | Legislature | Hansen, B. name added |
2019-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 07, 2019 |
2019-01-28 | Legislature | Lindstrom name added |
2019-01-16 | Legislature | Arch name added |
2019-01-16 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks name added |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2019-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |