NE LB152 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Notice of hearing for January 25, 2021
Pending: Legislature General Affairs Committee
Hearing: Jan 25 @ 9:30 am in Room 1510
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions regarding fireworks

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions regarding fireworks

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-15LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 25, 2021
2021-01-12LegislatureReferred to General Affairs Committee
2021-01-08LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback