NE LB149 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Approved by Governor on May 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to sale and use of tobacco products, electronic nicotine delivery systems, and alternative nicotine products

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to sale and use of tobacco products, electronic nicotine delivery systems, and alternative nicotine products

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Hansen, M. AM965 adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Quick AM1679 lost (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 20 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Legislature - General Affairs AM901 adopted (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Legislature - Quick FA62 adopted (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Legislature - Wayne AM1228 lost (Y: 21 N: 21 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - Legislature - Friesen AM1478 lost (Y: 22 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31LegislatureApproved by Governor on May 30, 2019
2019-05-30LegislaturePresented to Governor on May 24, 2019
2019-05-24LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2019-05-24LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 45-0-4
2019-05-22LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2019-05-21LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2019-05-21LegislatureHansen, M. AM965 adopted
2019-05-21LegislatureHansen, M. AM965 filed
2019-05-21LegislatureQuick AM1679 lost
2019-05-21LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER104 adopted
2019-05-10LegislatureQuick AM1679 filed
2019-05-02LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER104 filed
2019-05-02LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER104
2019-04-30LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2019-04-30LegislatureGeneral Affairs AM901 adopted
2019-04-30LegislatureQuick FA62 adopted
2019-04-30LegislatureQuick FA62 filed
2019-04-30LegislatureWayne AM1228 lost
2019-04-30LegislatureFriesen AM1478 lost
2019-04-30LegislatureGeneral Affairs AM901 pending
2019-04-26LegislatureWayne AM1228 filed
2019-04-25LegislatureFriesen AM1478 filed
2019-03-25LegislatureGeneral Affairs AM901 filed
2019-03-25LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM901
2019-03-19LegislatureQuick priority bill
2019-02-21LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 04, 2019
2019-02-12LegislatureHunt name withdrawn
2019-01-15LegislatureReferred to General Affairs Committee
2019-01-11LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=36920
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB149.pdf
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Final/LB149.pdf
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Slip/LB149.pdf
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4611
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4614
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4619
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4620
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4621
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4900
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4901
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=5022

Bill Comments

feedback