NE LB147 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Provisions/portions of LB582 amended into LB147 by AM926
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Provisions/portions of LB582 amended into LB147 by AM926
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to retirement systems for Class V school districts
Title
Change provisions relating to retirement systems for Class V school districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - Legislature - Kolterman MO112 prevailed (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 38-3-8 (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Legislature - Nebraska Retirement Systems AM926 adopted (Y: 32 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 38-3-8 (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Legislature - Nebraska Retirement Systems AM926 adopted (Y: 32 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB582 amended into LB147 by AM926 |
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB146 amended into LB147 by AM926 |
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB145 amended into LB147 by AM926 |
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Presented to Secretary of State on May 26, 2021 |
2021-05-26 | Legislature | Certificate |
2021-05-26 | Legislature | Communication |
2021-05-26 | Legislature | Passed notwithstanding objections of the Governor 31-18-0 |
2021-05-26 | Legislature | Kolterman MO112 prevailed |
2021-05-26 | Legislature | Kolterman MO112 Becomes law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor filed |
2021-05-26 | Legislature | Returned by Governor without approval on May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 38-3-8 |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2021-05-12 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2021-05-12 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER91 adopted |
2021-05-10 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER91 filed |
2021-05-10 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER91 |
2021-05-06 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-05-06 | Legislature | Kolterman AM295 withdrawn |
2021-05-06 | Legislature | Nebraska Retirement Systems AM926 adopted |
2021-04-23 | Legislature | Hansen, M. name added |
2021-04-23 | Legislature | Vargas name added |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks name added |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. name added |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Walz name added |
2021-04-15 | Legislature | Wayne name added |
2021-04-14 | Legislature | McCollister name added |
2021-04-14 | Legislature | Wishart name added |
2021-04-14 | Legislature | Lindstrom name added |
2021-04-14 | Legislature | Williams name added |
2021-04-12 | Legislature | Nebraska Retirement Systems AM926 filed |
2021-04-12 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM926 |
2021-03-02 | Legislature | Nebraska Retirement Systems priority bill |
2021-02-23 | Legislature | Kolterman AM295 filed |
2021-02-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 23, 2021 |
2021-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee |
2021-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |