NE LB146 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Approved by Governor on February 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for set-asides of convictions for infractions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for set-asides of convictions for infractions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-08 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-15LegislatureApproved by Governor on February 14, 2018
2018-02-08LegislaturePresented to Governor on February 08, 2018
2018-02-08LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2018-02-08LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 48-0-1
2018-01-30LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2018-01-26LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2018-01-16LegislaturePlaced on Select File
2018-01-08LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2018-01-08LegislatureHansen AM308 adopted
2018-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2017-02-23LegislatureHansen AM308 filed
2017-01-30LegislaturePlaced on General File
2017-01-17LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 25, 2017
2017-01-10LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2017-01-09LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback