NE LB146 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-19 - Approved by Governor on February 15, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-19 - Approved by Governor on February 15, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to funds transfers under the Uniform Commercial Code
Title
Change provisions relating to funds transfers under the Uniform Commercial Code
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gloor [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-19 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on February 15, 2013 |
2013-02-12 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on February 11, 2013 |
2013-02-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2013-02-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 |
2013-02-06 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2013-02-05 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2013-01-30 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2013-01-28 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2013-01-23 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2013-01-15 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 22, 2013 |
2013-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2013-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |