NE LB143 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Approved by Governor on May 5, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Approved by Governor on May 5, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change notice requirements regarding changes in a juvenile's placement
Title
Change notice requirements regarding changes in a juvenile's placement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Legislature - Health and Human Services AM105 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Legislature - Health and Human Services AM105 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 5, 2021 |
2021-04-29 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 29, 2021 |
2021-04-29 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2021-04-29 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 |
2021-04-14 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2021-04-12 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2021-04-12 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER41 adopted |
2021-03-31 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER41 filed |
2021-03-31 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER41 |
2021-03-29 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-03-29 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM105 adopted |
2021-03-29 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2021-03-17 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2021-03-09 | Legislature | Murman name added |
2021-02-19 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM105 filed |
2021-02-19 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM105 |
2021-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 03, 2021 |
2021-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2021-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |