NE LB14 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Require successful completion of a civics examination as a prerequisite to high school graduation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require successful completion of a civics examination as a prerequisite to high school graduation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2018-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2017-03-21LegislatureBrewer name added
2017-03-15LegislatureKrist AM625 filed
2017-03-02LegislatureMcCollister name added
2017-02-16LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 20, 2017
2017-01-12LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 17, 2017 (cancel)
2017-01-12LegislatureGroene MO5 prevailed
2017-01-11LegislatureGroene MO5 Permit cancellation of hearing on January 17, 2017 filed
2017-01-10LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 17, 2017
2017-01-09LegislatureReferred to Education Committee
2017-01-05LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback