NE LB1396 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change labeling provisions relating to misbranded food under the Nebraska Pure Food Act
Title
Change labeling provisions relating to misbranded food under the Nebraska Pure Food Act
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Murman [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-02-12 | Legislature | Erdman name added |
2024-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 13, 2024 |
2024-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Agriculture Committee |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |