NE LB139 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Passed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Approved by Governor on March 11, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Passed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Approved by Governor on March 11, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change the jurisdictional amount of the Small Claims Court
Title
Change the jurisdictional amount of the Small Claims Court
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brandt [N] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 43-0-6 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Legislature - Judiciary AM1518 adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Legislature - Brandt FA212 adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Legislature - Judiciary AM1518 adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Legislature - Brandt FA212 adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 7, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2024-03-07 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 43-0-6 |
2024-02-28 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2024-02-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2024-02-20 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER61 adopted |
2024-02-14 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER61 filed |
2024-02-14 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER61 |
2024-02-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2024-02-08 | Legislature | Judiciary AM1518 adopted |
2024-02-08 | Legislature | Brandt FA212 adopted |
2024-02-08 | Legislature | Brandt FA212 filed |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-05-03 | Legislature | Judiciary AM1518 filed |
2023-05-03 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1518 |
2023-02-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 03, 2023 |
2023-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-01-06 | Legislature | Date of introduction |