NE LB139 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Provisions/portions of LB53 amended into LB139 by AM1293
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Provisions/portions of LB53 amended into LB139 by AM1293
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the COVID-19 Liability Act and the Health Care Crisis Protocol Act
Title
Adopt the COVID-19 Liability Act and the Health Care Crisis Protocol Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Briese [N] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 41-1-7 (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. MO99 failed (Y: 3 N: 40 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-11 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Legislature - Judiciary AM1293 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Legislature - Lathrop AM1375 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. MO99 failed (Y: 3 N: 40 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-11 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Legislature - Judiciary AM1293 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Legislature - Lathrop AM1375 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB53 amended into LB139 by AM1293 |
2021-05-26 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 41-1-7 |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO100 withdrawn |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO100 Recommit to the Judiciary Committee filed |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO99 failed |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO99 Bracket until May 26, 2021 filed |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO94 withdrawn |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO94 Bracket until May 21, 2021 filed |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER97 adopted |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER97 filed |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER97 |
2021-05-11 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-05-11 | Legislature | Judiciary AM1293 adopted |
2021-05-11 | Legislature | Chair ruled Hunt AM1372 is not germane |
2021-05-11 | Legislature | Hunt AM1372 filed |
2021-05-11 | Legislature | Lathrop AM1375 adopted |
2021-05-11 | Legislature | Lathrop AM1375 filed |
2021-05-10 | Legislature | Judiciary AM1293 filed |
2021-05-10 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1293 |
2021-03-11 | Legislature | Slama priority bill |
2021-02-04 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 18, 2021 |
2021-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |