NE LB1355 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB1325 amended into LB1355 by AM2559
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for release of certain patient data by an emergency medical service, change provisions of the Opioid Prevention and Treatment Act, and provide for state aid, research, first responder training, and overdose fatality review

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for release of certain patient data by an emergency medical service, change provisions of the Opioid Prevention and Treatment Act, and provide for state aid, research, first responder training, and overdose fatality review

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-04-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 41-0-8 (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Legislature - Vargas AM3194 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Legislature - Vargas FA312 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Legislature - Health and Human Services AM2559 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Legislature - Vargas AM2629 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-25LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB1325 amended into LB1355 by AM2559
2024-04-25LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB1320 amended into LB1355 by AM2559
2024-04-18LegislatureApproved by Governor on April 16, 2024
2024-04-18LegislaturePresented to Governor on April 11, 2024
2024-04-11LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2024-04-11LegislaturePassed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 41-0-8
2024-04-11LegislatureDispensing of reading at large approved
2024-04-02LegislatureEnrollment and Review ST56 recorded
2024-04-02LegislatureEnrollment and Review ST56 filed
2024-04-02LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading with ST56
2024-03-25LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2024-03-25LegislatureBosn AM3153 withdrawn
2024-03-25LegislatureBosn AM3153 filed
2024-03-25LegislatureVargas AM3194 adopted
2024-03-25LegislatureVargas FA312 adopted
2024-03-25LegislatureVargas FA312 to AM3194 filed
2024-03-25LegislatureVargas AM3194 to ER74 filed
2024-03-25LegislatureVargas AM3107 withdrawn
2024-03-25LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER74 adopted
2024-03-19LegislatureVargas AM3107 to ER74 filed
2024-03-04LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER74 filed
2024-03-04LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER74
2024-02-21LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2024-02-21LegislatureHealth and Human Services AM2559 adopted
2024-02-21LegislatureVargas AM2629 adopted
2024-02-21LegislatureVargas AM2629 to AM2559 filed
2024-02-20LegislatureHealth and Human Services AM2559 filed
2024-02-20LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM2559
2024-02-14LegislatureVargas priority bill
2024-01-31LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 07, 2024
2024-01-18LegislatureReferred to Health and Human Services Committee
2024-01-17LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=55637
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/Intro/LB1355.pdf
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/Final/LB1355.pdf
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/Slip/LB1355.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/ER74.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM3107.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM2559.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM2629.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM3194.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM3153.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/FA312.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/ST56.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/SI/LB1355.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/FN/LB1355_20240206-124323.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/CS/LB1355.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/FN/LB1355_20240315-101639.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/FN/LB1355_20240404-144348.pdf
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=10103
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=10104
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=10105
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=10513
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=10514
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=11120

Bill Comments

feedback