NE LB1339 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB1339 amended into LB1329 by AM2831
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB1339 amended into LB1329 by AM2831
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to possession of firearms in schools and authorize schools to provide emergency response mapping data to public safety agencies
Title
Change provisions relating to possession of firearms in schools and authorize schools to provide emergency response mapping data to public safety agencies
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brewer [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1339 amended into LB1329 by AM2831 |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 06, 2024 |
2024-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |