NE LB132 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Automatic Renewal Limitation Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Automatic Renewal Limitation Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2023-05-23LegislatureHunt AM1865 filed
2023-05-23LegislatureHunt AM1864 filed
2023-01-13LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 24, 2023
2023-01-10LegislatureReferred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee
2023-01-06LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback