NE LB132 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Placed on Select File
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Create the School Financing Review Commission

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Create the School Financing Review Commission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-06 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Legislature - Education AM555 lost (Y: 1 N: 35 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-05-05 - Legislature - DeBoer AM1199 adopted (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-07LegislaturePlaced on Select File
2021-05-06LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2021-05-06LegislatureEducation AM555 lost
2021-05-06LegislatureGroene AM1246 withdrawn
2021-05-06LegislatureFriesen MO60 withdrawn
2021-05-06LegislatureFriesen MO60 pending
2021-05-06LegislatureFriesen MO60 Recommit to the Education Committee filed
2021-05-06LegislatureBrandt AM1247 withdrawn
2021-05-06LegislatureLinehan AM1203 withdrawn
2021-05-05LegislatureGroene AM1246 filed
2021-05-05LegislatureBrandt AM1247 filed
2021-05-05LegislatureLinehan AM1203 pending
2021-05-05LegislatureEducation AM555 pending
2021-05-05LegislatureDeBoer AM1199 adopted
2021-05-05LegislatureDeBoer AM1175 withdrawn
2021-04-29LegislatureDeBoer AM1199 filed
2021-04-29LegislatureLinehan AM1203 filed
2021-04-28LegislatureDeBoer AM1175 filed
2021-03-12LegislatureLegislature's Planning Committee priority bill
2021-03-11LegislatureEducation AM555 filed
2021-03-11LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM555
2021-01-25LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 02, 2021
2021-01-19LegislatureKolterman name added
2021-01-12LegislatureHunt name added
2021-01-11LegislatureHansen, M. name added
2021-01-11LegislatureReferred to Education Committee
2021-01-07LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=43458
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/Intro/LB132.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/AM555.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/AM1175.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/AM1203.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/AM1199.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/AM1247.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/AM1246.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/MO60.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/FN/LB132_20210201-062259.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/SI/LB132.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/CS/LB132.pdf
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=6934
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=6944
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=6945

Bill Comments 750

feedback