NE LB1316 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminate provisions relating to the base growth percentage for school districts under the School District Property Tax Limitation Act
Title
Eliminate provisions relating to the base growth percentage for school districts under the School District Property Tax Limitation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Lou Linehan [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 31, 2024 |
2024-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |