NE LB1305 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB1305 amended into LB1317 by AM3362
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibit tax liability on the purchase, sale, or exchange of gold or silver bullion, change sales tax exemption provisions relating to currency and bullion, and provide an income tax adjustment for net capital losses and gains on the sale or exchange of gold or silver

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibit tax liability on the purchase, sale, or exchange of gold or silver bullion, change sales tax exemption provisions relating to currency and bullion, and provide an income tax adjustment for net capital losses and gains on the sale or exchange of gold or silver

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-25LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB1305 amended into LB1317 by AM3362
2024-04-18LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2024-03-28LegislatureRevenue AM2681 filed
2024-03-28LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM2681
2024-03-07LegislatureKauth name added
2024-02-08LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 15, 2024
2024-02-07LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 14, 2024 (cancel)
2024-02-07LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 14, 2024
2024-01-18LegislatureReferred to Revenue Committee
2024-01-17LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback