NE LB1295 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB1295 amended into LB1317 by AM3246
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB1295 amended into LB1317 by AM3246
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Financial Institution Data Match Act
Title
Adopt the Financial Institution Data Match Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1295 amended into LB1317 by AM3246 |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-02-07 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 14, 2024 |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2024-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |