NE LB1285 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create the Task Force on Supported Employment
Title
Create the Task Force on Supported Employment
Sponsors
Sen. Lynne Walz [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-03-07 | Legislature | Executive Board AM2850 filed |
2024-03-07 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2850 |
2024-02-06 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 28, 2024 |
2024-01-19 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2024-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |