NE LB1274 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require the Department of Transportation to plan, design, and purchase rights-of-way for U.S. Highway 81 and Nebraska Highway 20
Title
Require the Department of Transportation to plan, design, and purchase rights-of-way for U.S. Highway 81 and Nebraska Highway 20
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Flood [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 31, 2022 |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |