NE LB126 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 13 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for additional limited landowner deer hunting permits

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for additional limited landowner deer hunting permits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-13 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 14 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Legislature - Hughes AM2380 adopted (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 15 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Legislature - Hughes AM2150 adopted (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Legislature - Natural Resources AM757 adopted (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2020-02-13LegislatureHughes AM2380 adopted
2020-02-13LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER160 adopted
2020-02-12LegislatureHughes AM2380 filed
2020-01-31LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER160 filed
2020-01-31LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER160
2020-01-30LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2020-01-30LegislatureBostelman MO142 withdrawn
2020-01-30LegislatureBostelman MO142 Reconsider the vote on AM2150 filed
2020-01-30LegislatureHughes AM2150 adopted
2020-01-30LegislatureNatural Resources AM757 adopted
2020-01-27LegislatureHughes AM2150 filed
2020-01-08LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2019-04-05LegislatureNatural Resources AM757 filed
2019-04-05LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM757
2019-01-16LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 23, 2019
2019-01-14LegislatureReferred to Natural Resources Committee
2019-01-10LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback