NE LB126 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-27 - Approved by Governor on February 26, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-27 - Approved by Governor on February 26, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change size of counties for applicability of certain county retirement programs and change contribution provisions for such programs
Title
Change size of counties for applicability of certain county retirement programs and change contribution provisions for such programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-20 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-27 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on February 26, 2015 |
2015-02-23 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on February 20, 2015 |
2015-02-20 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2015-02-20 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 |
2015-02-12 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2015-02-11 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2015-02-11 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER1 adopted |
2015-01-27 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER1 filed |
2015-01-27 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER1 |
2015-01-26 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2015-01-26 | Legislature | Nebraska Retirement Systems AM12 adopted |
2015-01-21 | Legislature | Nebraska Retirement Systems AM12 filed |
2015-01-21 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM12 |
2015-01-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 20, 2015 |
2015-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee |
2015-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |