NE LB1246 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB204 amended into LB1246 by AM1978
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB204 amended into LB1246 by AM1978
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Require confidentiality for victims of sexual assault and sex trafficking in criminal proceedings prior to the filing of charges and change provisions of the Sex Offender Registration Act
Title
Require confidentiality for victims of sexual assault and sex trafficking in criminal proceedings prior to the filing of charges and change provisions of the Sex Offender Registration Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Legislature - Slama AM1978 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Legislature - Judiciary AM1842 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Legislature - Slama AM1978 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Legislature - Judiciary AM1842 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB204 amended into LB1246 by AM1978 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 12, 2022 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2022-03-10 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2022-03-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2022-03-08 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER126 adopted |
2022-03-08 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER126 filed |
2022-03-08 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER126 |
2022-03-02 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2022-03-02 | Legislature | Slama AM1978 adopted |
2022-03-02 | Legislature | Slama AM1978 filed |
2022-03-02 | Legislature | Judiciary AM1842 adopted |
2022-02-23 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2022-02-16 | Legislature | Judiciary AM1842 filed |
2022-02-16 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1842 |
2022-02-08 | Legislature | DeBoer name added |
2022-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 03, 2022 |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |