NE LB1245 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB1245 amended into LB1413 by AM2698
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB1245 amended into LB1413 by AM2698
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to the Lead Service Line Cash Fund and provide for grants
Title
Change provisions relating to the Lead Service Line Cash Fund and provide for grants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1245 amended into LB1413 by AM2698 |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 02, 2024 |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2024-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |