NE LB1245 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions and terminology relating to determinations of paternity and parentage, birth certificates, and related matters
Title
Change provisions and terminology relating to determinations of paternity and parentage, birth certificates, and related matters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 16, 2022 |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |