NE LB1244 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to limitations for a postconviction relief action
Title
Change provisions relating to limitations for a postconviction relief action
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-02-16 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2022-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 03, 2022 |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |