NE LB124 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to reports of the Inspector General of the Nebraska Correctional System
Title
Change provisions relating to reports of the Inspector General of the Nebraska Correctional System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-03-04 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2021-02-02 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 11, 2021 |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-01-07 | Legislature | Date of introduction |