NE LB124 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Approved by Governor on March 21, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Approved by Governor on March 21, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to jointly created clean energy assessment districts under the Property Assessed Clean Energy Act
Title
Change provisions relating to jointly created clean energy assessment districts under the Property Assessed Clean Energy Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 44-0-5 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Legislature - Crawford AM405 adopted (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Legislature - Urban Affairs AM199 adopted (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Legislature - Crawford AM405 adopted (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Legislature - Urban Affairs AM199 adopted (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-18 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 15, 2019 |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 44-0-5 |
2019-03-06 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Crawford AM405 adopted |
2019-02-22 | Legislature | Crawford AM405 filed |
2019-02-21 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2019-02-13 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-02-13 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM199 adopted |
2019-02-08 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM199 filed |
2019-02-08 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM199 |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2019 |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2019-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |