NE LB1232 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit certain actions under the Pharmacy Benefit Manager Licensure and Regulation Act
Title
Prohibit certain actions under the Pharmacy Benefit Manager Licensure and Regulation Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-19 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 27, 2024 |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2024-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |