NE LB1229 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transfer duties related to housing from the Department of Economic Development to the Nebraska Investment Finance Authority and change and provide powers and duties for the authority
Title
Transfer duties related to housing from the Department of Economic Development to the Nebraska Investment Finance Authority and change and provide powers and duties for the authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-19 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 06, 2024 |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2024-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |