NE LB122 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Approved by Governor on April 27, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for family member visitation petitions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for family member visitation petitions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-02LegislatureApproved by Governor on April 27, 2017
2017-04-24LegislaturePresented to Governor on April 24, 2017
2017-04-24LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2017-04-24LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 48-0-1
2017-04-10LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2017-04-04LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2017-04-04LegislatureClements AM919 withdrawn
2017-04-04LegislatureClements AM919 filed
2017-04-04LegislaturePansing Brooks AM843 adopted
2017-04-03LegislaturePansing Brooks AM843 filed
2017-03-31LegislaturePlaced on Select File
2017-03-28LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2017-03-28LegislatureJudiciary AM223 adopted
2017-03-07LegislatureBaker priority bill
2017-02-14LegislatureJudiciary AM223 filed
2017-02-14LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM223
2017-02-13LegislatureBaker name added
2017-01-24LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 09, 2017
2017-01-10LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2017-01-06LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback