NE LB1218 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-08-06 - Wayne MO223 Vote on advancement of the bill without further amendment or debate filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Nebraska Historically Underutilized Business Program Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Nebraska Historically Underutilized Business Program Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-06LegislatureWayne MO223 Vote on advancement of the bill without further amendment or debate filed
2020-08-04LegislatureGovernment, Military and Veterans Affairs AM3242 filed
2020-08-04LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM3242
2020-07-31LegislatureVargas name added
2020-03-12LegislatureHansen, M. name added
2020-03-12LegislatureCavanaugh name added
2020-02-21LegislatureWayne priority bill
2020-02-03LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 13, 2020
2020-01-27LegislatureReferred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
2020-01-23LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback