NE LB121 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to eligibility for Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program benefits
Title
Change provisions relating to eligibility for Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program benefits
Sponsors
Sen. Megan Hunt [N] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 25 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-04-11 | Legislature | Slama FA217 filed |
2022-04-11 | Legislature | Slama FA216 filed |
2022-04-11 | Legislature | Slama FA215 pending |
2022-04-11 | Legislature | Slama FA215 pending |
2022-04-11 | Legislature | Slama FA215 filed |
2022-04-11 | Legislature | Slama FA212 withdrawn |
2022-04-11 | Legislature | Slama FA212 pending |
2022-04-11 | Legislature | Slama FA212 filed |
2022-04-11 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER153 adopted |
2022-03-23 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER153 filed |
2022-03-23 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER153 |
2022-03-22 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. name added |
2022-03-22 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2022-02-14 | Legislature | Hunt priority bill |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-03-29 | Legislature | Kolterman name added |
2021-03-09 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2021-02-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 17, 2021 |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2021-01-07 | Legislature | Date of introduction |