NE LB1199 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate federal funds to the Department of Administrative Services for the Chief Information Officer to provide radios to volunteer departments
Title
Appropriate federal funds to the Department of Administrative Services for the Chief Information Officer to provide radios to volunteer departments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 23, 2022 |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Kolterman name added |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |