NE LB1193 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB1193 amended into LB71 by AM2589
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provide a process for a parent or guardian to request that such person's child repeat a grade under certain circumstances

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide a process for a parent or guardian to request that such person's child repeat a grade under certain circumstances

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-25LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB1193 amended into LB71 by AM2589
2024-04-18LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2024-02-20LegislaturePlaced on General File
2024-01-30LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 05, 2024
2024-01-16LegislatureReferred to Education Committee
2024-01-12LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback