NE LB1193 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB1193 amended into LB71 by AM2589
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB1193 amended into LB71 by AM2589
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide a process for a parent or guardian to request that such person's child repeat a grade under certain circumstances
Title
Provide a process for a parent or guardian to request that such person's child repeat a grade under certain circumstances
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1193 amended into LB71 by AM2589 |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-02-20 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2024-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2024 |
2024-01-16 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2024-01-12 | Legislature | Date of introduction |