NE LB1193 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide limitations regarding federal funds appropriations relating to the federal Consolidated Appropriations Act, 2021, and the federal American Rescue Plan Act of 2021
Title
Provide limitations regarding federal funds appropriations relating to the federal Consolidated Appropriations Act, 2021, and the federal American Rescue Plan Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-03-09 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2022-03-03 | Legislature | Vargas name added |
2022-01-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 02, 2022 |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |