NE LB1192 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for a temporary injunction upon filing for separation or divorce, a presumption of joint custody and parenting time, sanctions for misconduct by a party, and reports
Title
Provide for a temporary injunction upon filing for separation or divorce, a presumption of joint custody and parenting time, sanctions for misconduct by a party, and reports
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 16, 2022 |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |