NE LB1191 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require the Department of Health and Human Services, the Office of Juvenile Services, and the Department of Correctional Services to allow employees to speak to members of the Legislature and the Public Counsel
Title
Require the Department of Health and Human Services, the Office of Juvenile Services, and the Department of Correctional Services to allow employees to speak to members of the Legislature and the Public Counsel
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Howard [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-02-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 20, 2020 |
2020-01-28 | Legislature | McCollister name added |
2020-01-27 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2020-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=41604 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB1191.pdf |