NE LB1184 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB1184 amended into LB937 by AM3206
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Reverse Osmosis System Tax Credit Act, provide for income tax credits, and state intent relating to appropriations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Reverse Osmosis System Tax Credit Act, provide for income tax credits, and state intent relating to appropriations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-25LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB1184 amended into LB937 by AM3206
2024-04-18LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2024-03-04LegislatureBlood name added
2024-02-08LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 15, 2024
2024-01-16LegislatureReferred to Revenue Committee
2024-01-12LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback