NE LB1184 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to duties of the Attorney General to defend the Nebraska State Patrol
Title
Change provisions relating to duties of the Attorney General to defend the Nebraska State Patrol
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Legislature - Judiciary AM1962 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Legislature - Judiciary AM1962 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 12, 2022 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 |
2022-04-05 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST66 |
2022-03-31 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2022-03-16 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2022-03-14 | Legislature | Bostar name added |
2022-03-14 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2022-03-14 | Legislature | Judiciary AM1962 adopted |
2022-03-14 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. FA103 withdrawn |
2022-03-10 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. FA103 filed |
2022-02-22 | Legislature | Judiciary AM1962 filed |
2022-02-22 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1962 |
2022-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 10, 2022 |
2022-01-21 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-19 | Legislature | Date of introduction |