NE LB1183 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-11 - Approved by Governor on August 07, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Population Health Information Act, create the Health Information Technology Board, and change prescription drug monitoring program and statewide health information exchange provisions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Population Health Information Act, create the Health Information Technology Board, and change prescription drug monitoring program and statewide health information exchange provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-03 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Legislature - Arch AM3058 adopted (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Legislature - Health and Human Services AM2607 adopted (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-11LegislatureApproved by Governor on August 07, 2020
2020-08-03LegislaturePresented to Governor on August 03, 2020
2020-08-03LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2020-08-03LegislaturePassed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2
2020-08-03LegislatureDispensing of reading at large approved
2020-07-31LegislatureVargas name added
2020-07-23LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2020-07-20LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2020-07-20LegislatureArch AM3058 adopted
2020-07-20LegislatureArch AM3058 filed
2020-07-20LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER205 adopted
2020-03-23LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER205 filed
2020-03-23LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER205
2020-03-09LegislatureBlood name added
2020-03-09LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2020-03-09LegislatureChambers MO162 withdrawn
2020-03-09LegislatureChambers MO162 Indefinitely postpone filed
2020-03-09LegislatureHealth and Human Services AM2607 adopted
2020-03-04LegislatureHealth and Human Services AM2607 filed
2020-03-04LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM2607
2020-02-21LegislatureHilgers priority bill
2020-02-05LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 13, 2020
2020-01-27LegislatureReferred to Health and Human Services Committee
2020-01-23LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback