NE LB1182 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the School Employees Pandemic Protection Act and state intent regarding federal funds
Title
Adopt the School Employees Pandemic Protection Act and state intent regarding federal funds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 28, 2022 |
2022-01-27 | Legislature | Rereferred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-21 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2022-01-19 | Legislature | Date of introduction |